Meindok, Harry (CPSO#: 19613)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2012