Meinert, Paul Christian (CPSO#: 63683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Baywood Center
Suite 202
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-7593
Fax: (905) 683-7669
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Meinert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Meinert ( CPSO# 63683 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
95 Bay Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-7593

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTIAN MEINERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEINERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 1997 to 28 Feb 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999