Mekonnen Tizazu, Girma (CPSO#: 87632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carea Community Health Center
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Phone: (905) 723-0036
Fax: (905) 723-3391
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIRMA MEKONNEN TIZAZU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEKONNEN TIZAZU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2010