Melady, Donald Louis (CPSO#: 59454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD LOUIS MELADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 9, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Donald Louis Melady in respect to an incident that took place in February 2005.