Melamed, Nir (CPSO#: 99280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nir Melamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Melamed ( CPSO# 99280 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
M4-140 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M3N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2012 to 17 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nir Melamed may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics  and  Gynaecology,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Melamed  holds  an academic appointment at the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Melamed
                  no longer holds the academic appointment, referred to in clause 1.