Melchior, Maria Franca (CPSO#: 70266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 207-1998
Fax: (416) 207-9501
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Melchior Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Melchior ( CPSO# 70266 )

Business Address:
604 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 207-1998

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 207-1998

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 207-1998

Business Address:
North York General
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA FRANCA MELCHIOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELCHIOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001