Melega, Douglas Edwin (CPSO#: 63776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C/O Dept. of Pathology
Grand River Hospital
P.O. Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2158
Fax: (519) 749-4221
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS EDWIN MELEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELEGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1992