Melemis, Steven Michael (CPSO#: 56839)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can send an email to contact@stevenmelemis.com.
Date Received: 15 Mar 2017


Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may email Dr. Melemis at: contact@stevenmelemis.com.
Date Received: 26 Jan 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 2017