Melicharkova, Andrea (CPSO#: 86617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Spanish

Education:Universidad del Salvador, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4539
Fax: (705) 876-4557
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Melicharkova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Melicharkova ( CPSO# 86617 )

Business Address:
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4539

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MELICHARKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELICHARKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011