Meloff, Keith Lyon (CPSO#: 25167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Meloff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Meloff ( CPSO# 25167 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 5, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Keith Lyon Meloff, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Meloff to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Meloff has restricted his practice to performing independent medical
                  examinations and preparing third party medical reports as an independent
                  medical examiner.  He does not treat any patients in any capacity.
                  
                  Dr. Meloff has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                              
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs                                    
            (as defined under the Narcotic 
            Safety and Awareness Act, S.O. 
            2010, c. 22)                               Relinquished