Melosky, Barbara Lynne (CPSO#: 58436)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989