Melton, Ellen (CPSO#: 78583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Novosibirsk Medical Institute, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Melton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Melton ( CPSO# 78583 )

Business Address:
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-3355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN MELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 01 Apr 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 May 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010