Melville, Rhona Delores Spencer (CPSO#: 52660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Talbot Village, P O Box 36082, London, ON, N6P 0B0
Instructions: Folliwing information is required: Patient's name, Date of Birth, address, signed and dated consent to release records, name and address of party to whom the records are to be sent, name and address of party to whom bill is to be sent
Date Received: 20 Jul 2016


Address: 357 Southdale Road East London, ON N6E 1A2
Date Received: 22 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014