Memarpour, Mahdi (CPSO#: 81370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 5883
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2862
Fax: (905) 830-5977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Memarpour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Memarpour ( CPSO# 81370 )

Business Address:
West Building 5th Floor
596 Davis Drive
Room 5883
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHDI MEMARPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEMARPOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 02 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 11 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Dec 2007 to 10 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Dec 2008 to 10 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009