Menard, Joseph Andre Eugene (CPSO#: 23477)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006