Menard, Matthew Robert Noel (CPSO#: 97127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Haida Gwaii Hospital
2520 Harrison Avenue
Masset BC  V0T 1M0
Phone: (250) 626-4700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT NOEL MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2012 to 15 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012