Menchions, Charles William Bruce (CPSO#: 54219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Bank Plaza
P O Box 83
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J2
Phone: (416) 363-8850
Fax: (416) 363-9466
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trilium Health Centre
Community Mental Health Centre
Suite 300
2085 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7583
Fax: (905) 848-7357
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 388-2511 Ext. 36294
Fax: (905) 575-6082
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES WILLIAM BRUCE MENCHIONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENCHIONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1985