Mendelson, Michael Maxwell (CPSO#: 91189)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children Department of Cardiology 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 04 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2015