Mendelssohn, David Charles (CPSO#: 52995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Division of Nephrology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 658-2241
Fax: 416-658-2242
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Mendelssohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mendelssohn ( CPSO# 52995 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Division of Nephrology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (289) 772-6992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES MENDELSSOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDELSSOHN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985