Mendes, Carmen Luize Kummer de Paula (CPSO#: 83125)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009