Mendez, Ivar Marcelo (CPSO#: 57098)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1996