Mendez Probst, Carlos Enrique (CPSO#: 89920)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De Guadalajara, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Oct 2008 to 28 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endourology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Endourology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endourology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endourology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010