Mendez, Rosendo (CPSO#: 24003)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1998