Mendonca, Paul Vinay (CPSO#: 81715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
1515 Gordon Street
Guelph ON  N1L 1C9
Phone: (519) 829-1212
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Mendonca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mendonca ( CPSO# 81715 )

Business Address:
110 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 829-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL VINAY MENDONCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDONCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006