Menes, Catharine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32757)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. E. Menes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 7, 55 Frid Street, Hamilton, ON, L8P 4M3
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016