Menezes, Allison Virginia (CPSO#: 55301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Misquitta, Allison Virginia (used until: 21 Jul 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1996