Meng, Joanne (CPSO#: 63235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer
Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70212
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Meng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2012


Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Meng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meng ( CPSO# 63235 )
Dr. J. Hovey ( CPSO# 63467 )

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O.Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1A5
Phone Number: (613) 692-4262

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE MENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 22 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1990