Menkis, Alan Harold (CPSO#: 51215)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2005