Mennie, Jocelyn Mae (CPSO#: 57345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Names: Rowe, Jocelyn Mae (used until: 23 Apr 2012 )     Haynal, Jocelyn Mae (used until: 22 Jan 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
James A Haley Veterans Hospital
Mailcode 11G
1300 Bruce B Downs Boulevard
Tampa FL  33612
United States
Phone: (813) 610-7167

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYN MAE MENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENNIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1994