Menon, Anilkumar S (CPSO#: 63972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 456-9370
Fax: (905) 453-8672
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anilkumar Menon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Menon ( CPSO# 63972 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 456-9370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANILKUMAR S MENON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1993