Menon, Kusum (CPSO#: 61280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Paediatric ICU
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2538
Fax: (613) 738-4287
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUSUM MENON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Jul 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992