Mensinkai, Arun Sarvottam (CPSO#: 81655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton, ON
L8L 2X2
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 45521
Fax: (905) 527-5781
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arun Mensinkai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mensinkai ( CPSO# 81655 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN SARVOTTAM MENSINKAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENSINKAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010