Menuck, Morton Norman (CPSO#: 24559)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morton Menuck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013