Merali, Abbas Muhammad (CPSO#: 89037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 309
564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 744-1167
Fax: (519) 744-1168
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abbas Merali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali ( CPSO# 89037 )

Business Address:
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 309
564 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 744-4467

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABBAS MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012