Merali, Ali-Reza Muhammad (CPSO#: 99867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
North Wing Room 8N-01
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-5092
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merali ( CPSO# 99867 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
North Wing Room 8N-01
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI-REZA MUHAMMAD MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 07 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015