Merbaum, Allyson Michelle (CPSO#: 73793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Muroff, Allyson Michelle (used until: 17 Aug 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 497-2650
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Street 4 South
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 4167566827
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Merbaum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Merbaum ( CPSO# 73793 )

Business Address:
704 - 240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 497-0880

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street 4 South
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLYSON MICHELLE MERBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERBAUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001