Mercante, Nadia Frances (CPSO#: 81313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: (905) 574-7300
Fax: (905) 574-2283
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Mercante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mercante ( CPSO# 81313 )

Business Address:
800 - 723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 574-7300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA FRANCES MERCANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCANTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006