Mercer, Jay Gordon (CPSO#: 66552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-2755
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mercer ( CPSO# 58605 )
Dr. J. Mercer ( CPSO# 66552 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Guyana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY GORDON MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995