Merchant, Pradeep Pranlal (CPSO#: 58641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Site Chief
Division of Neonatology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4267
Fax: (613) 761-5385
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E8
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pradeep Merchant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Merchant ( CPSO# 58641 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Site Chief
Division of Neonatology
C403 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 274-5759

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRADEEP PRANLAL MERCHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1994