Merchea, Man Mohan (CPSO#: 29616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Vikram University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Centre
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6284
Fax: (519) 646-6150
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6284
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohan Merchea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Merchea ( CPSO# 29616 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6284

Business Address:
3rd Floor
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6284

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAN MOHAN MERCHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHEA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1977