Merdad, Tarik Mahmood (CPSO#: 56645)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993