Merei, Laszlo (CPSO#: 17140)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Pecs, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995