Mereniuk, Alexandra (CPSO#: 104845)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2071

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2071

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2071