Mereu, Laurie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor Clinical Sciences Bldg
11350 83 Ave NW
Edmonton AB  T6G 2G3
Phone: (780) 492-3626
Fax: (780) 492-6444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ELIZABETH MEREU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEREU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991