Merino Juarez, Jose Guillermo (CPSO#: 74294)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2001