Merkley, Barry Douglas (CPSO#: 62365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 465-0756
Fax: (416) 465-8344
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY DOUGLAS MERKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERKLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991