Mernagh, John Richard (CPSO#: 56840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department Of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75297
Fax: (905) 521-1390
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 8, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 8, 2017, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that in early 2017 Dr. John Mernagh voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges in the areas of reporting of CT scans and pediatric ultrasound examinations while Hamilton Health Sciences was taking steps to initiate a formal structural review of Dr. Mernagh’s reporting of CT scans and pediatric ultrasound examinations.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD MERNAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERNAGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987