Merredew, Florence Nola (CPSO#: 33151)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010