Merritt, Keith Edison (CPSO#: 28850)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1993