Merritt, Thomas Rodman (CPSO#: 28544)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2009